OK SB554 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Agriculture; creating the Industrial Hemp Production Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; creating the Industrial Hemp Production Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-25SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback