OK SB553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Economic Action Plan of 1996; increasing population limits for eligible entities. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Rural Economic Action Plan of 1996; increasing population limits for eligible entities. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB553 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget