OK SB552 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB552
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Milk and Milk Products Act; removing exception; expanding intent. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Milk and Milk Products Act; removing exception; expanding intent. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB552 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019