OK SB550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; allowing purchases of alcoholic beverages with petty cash fund. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; allowing purchases of alcoholic beverages with petty cash fund. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Emergency added |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB550 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee