OK SB544 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - coauthored by Pittman
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - coauthored by Pittman
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Professional services and products; directing review of state contracts within certain time. Effective date,
Title
Professional services and products; directing review of state contracts within certain time. Effective date,
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Standridge |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Standridge; authored by Fry |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 5500 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 84A | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb544&Session=1500 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB544%20INT.PDF |