OK SB543 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB543
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; establishing a State Veterans' Cemetery System. Effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; establishing a State Veterans' Cemetery System. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-25 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | Title restored |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017