OK SB54 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; authorizing retired officers to retain items after retirement. Effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing retired officers to retain items after retirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |