OK SB536 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB536
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services; definitions used in the Emergency Response Systems Development Act; adding and modifying definitions. Effective date.
Title
Emergency medical services; definitions used in the Emergency Response Systems Development Act; adding and modifying definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2023-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB536 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - HAs read