OK SB509 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to alternative governance arrangements; modifying provisions related to alternative governance procedures. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to alternative governance arrangements; modifying provisions related to alternative governance procedures. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] |
Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Andrew Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: R (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2010-04-20 - House - House: (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: R (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 | |
2010-05-04 | Remove as coauthor Senator Corn | |
2010-05-04 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance), Garrison | |
2010-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14 | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 80 Nays: 6 | |
2010-04-20 | Ayes: 37 Nays: 55 | |
2010-04-20 | Motion to rescind vote failed | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 33; Ayes: 59 Nays: 32 | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Denney | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rice | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Rice | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Corn | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-19 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Corn | |
2009-02-11 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Coody | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 544 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 18 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |