OK SB506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Utilities, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Utilities, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; providing exception to prohibition against compensation from used tire recycling. Effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; providing exception to prohibition against compensation from used tire recycling. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Utilities, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Johns (principal House author) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB506 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Utilities