OK SB5 | 2013 | Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-04 - coauthored by Stiles
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-04 - coauthored by Stiles
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Summary judgment; establishing procedures for summary judgment. Emergency.
Title
Summary judgment; establishing procedures for summary judgment. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Aaron Stiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-04 | Senate | coauthored by Stiles |
2013-09-04 | Senate | coauthored by Jolley, Shortey |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-09-03 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-09-03 | Senate | coauthored by Sykes |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-09-03 | Senate | First Reading |