OK SB495 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB495
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire insurance; reduced rates; requiring insurers to obtain evidence of certain payments annually. Effective date.
Title
Fire insurance; reduced rates; requiring insurers to obtain evidence of certain payments annually. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Amended |
2017-04-13 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB495 (Carry Over) 2017-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2017