OK SB487 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB487
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Science and Technology Research and Development Board; modifying board of directors. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Science and Technology Research and Development Board; modifying board of directors. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-22 | House | Emergency added |
2021-04-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Pugh |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021