OK SB469 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB469
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid; requiring coverage of medically necessary pasteurized donor human milk under certain conditions. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Medicaid; requiring coverage of medically necessary pasteurized donor human milk under certain conditions. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Rep. John Waldron [D] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-21 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Floyd |
2022-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Lepak |
2022-04-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Miller |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB469 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee