OK SB467 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB467
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Coauthored by Senator Jech
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Coauthored by Senator Jech
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; requiring certain program participation for furnishing alcoholic beverage to persons under 21. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; requiring certain program participation for furnishing alcoholic beverage to persons under 21. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bennett (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB467 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - Coauthored by Senator Jech