OK SB458 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB458
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; agencies subject to certain information technology requirements; requiring special audit.
Title
Public finance; agencies subject to certain information technology requirements; requiring special audit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB458 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |