OK SB453 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Damages; adding damages for wrongful injuries to crops and livestock. Effective date.
Title
Damages; adding damages for wrongful injuries to crops and livestock. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Schwartz | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |