OK SB45 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Memorial bridge designations; designating certain bridge for Bass Reeves. Codification. Emergency.
Title
Memorial bridge designations; designating certain bridge for Bass Reeves. Codification. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] |
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-03 | First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-02 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2011-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Pittman, Shumate | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Faught (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Allen, Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Garrison | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |