OK SB448 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; relating to incarceration of single custodial parent; requiring written findings. Effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; relating to incarceration of single custodial parent; requiring written findings. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-11 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2009-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Denney | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Leftwich | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |