OK SB446 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; indecent exposure; clarify prosecution. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; indecent exposure; clarify prosecution. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Approved by Governor 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-04-04 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Insurance Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Glenn (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Wyrick | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |