OK SB445 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB445
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit; allocation and calculation of caps for Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credit; allocation and calculation of caps for Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 23 |
2017-04-25 | House | General Order |
2017-04-18 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Calvey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017