OK SB441 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; creating certain cause of action. Effective date.
Title
Institutions of higher education; creating certain cause of action. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-05 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-01 | Senate | coauthored by Virgin (principal House author) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |