OK SB440 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Coauthored by Senator Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; increasing number of days for in-person absentee voting. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; increasing number of days for in-person absentee voting. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Boren
2021-02-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2021-02-09SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback