OK SB440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB440
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Coauthored by Senator Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Coauthored by Senator Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; increasing number of days for in-person absentee voting. Effective date.
Title
Elections; increasing number of days for in-person absentee voting. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB440 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Coauthored by Senator Boren