OK SB43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB43


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]


Firearms; notification regarding certain carry on college campus. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Firearms; notification regarding certain carry on college campus. Effective date.


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]


2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
2017-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-06Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-27Senatecoauthored by Gann
2017-02-23SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Faught
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Bennett (John)
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Coody
2017-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB43 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental

Oklahoma State Sources

Bill Comments