OK SB420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB420
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Crime Victims Compensation Act; increasing time to file certain claim; increasing amounts of certain compensation. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Crime Victims Compensation Act; increasing time to file certain claim; increasing amounts of certain compensation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Clay Staires [R] | Rep. Jared Deck [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Staires (principal House author) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB420 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023