OK SB420 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
International and domestic livestock import and export; Oklahoma City and Tulsa airports. Effective date.
Title
International and domestic livestock import and export; Oklahoma City and Tulsa airports. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House: R (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House: R (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved by Governor 05/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-04-07 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2011-02-22 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Fields | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2A | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |