OK SB42 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Education Lottery Act; relates to powers of Oklahoma Lottery Commission; prohibits advertisements involving children. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Education Lottery Act; relates to powers of Oklahoma Lottery Commission; prohibits advertisements involving children. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Rep. Wade Rousselot [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | HAs read | |
2011-04-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 9; Ayes: 69 Nays: 24 | |
2011-04-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett | |
2011-04-05 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | Title restored | |
2011-03-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields | |
2011-03-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-24 | First Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-23 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Rousselot (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Garrison | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |