OK SB405 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education; contracts with retired employees; removing intent language; removing certain requirement for certain position. Effective date.
Title
Higher Education; contracts with retired employees; removing intent language; removing certain requirement for certain position. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | General Order |
2015-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Lepak and substitute with Representative Wallace |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Lepak (principal House author) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |