OK SB40 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; felony pointing firearms; physical or deadly force against an intruder. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; felony pointing firearms; physical or deadly force against an intruder. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateApproved by Governor 05/15/2017
2017-05-09SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-09SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Newberry
2017-05-08SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
2017-05-08SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 8
2017-04-25HouseEnacting clause restored
2017-04-25HouseTitle restored
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Roberts (Sean)
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-18HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-18HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
2017-04-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-13HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-04-13HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
2017-03-08SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-03-06Senatecoauthored by Coody
2017-03-02Senatecoauthored by Calvey
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-16SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateCoauthored by David
2017-02-06SenateRemove as author Senator David; authored by Bergstrom
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator David
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21128916New CodeSee Bill Text
21128925New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb40&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB40%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB40%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB40%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB40%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB40%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB40%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB40%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB40%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB40_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB40_votes.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback