OK SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB4
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; creating A Day of Remembrance. Effective date.
Title
Definitions and general provisions; creating A Day of Remembrance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/04/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2019-04-01 | House | General Order |
2019-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB4 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019