OK SB4 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB4
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; transferring duties of the Executive Director to the Commission; removing authority of Governor to appoint Director. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; transferring duties of the Executive Director to the Commission; removing authority of Governor to appoint Director. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] |
Sen. Mary Boren [D] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2023-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB4 (Carry Over) 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee