OK SB394 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB394
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax credit; modifying certain annual limit to the Oklahoma Tourism Development Act. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax credit; modifying certain annual limit to the Oklahoma Tourism Development Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB394 (Carry Over) 2023-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken