OK SB394 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB394
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program; modifying minimum requirements; increasing amount of certain excluded equity allowance. Emergency.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program; modifying minimum requirements; increasing amount of certain excluded equity allowance. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. John Talley [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren |
2021-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Emergency added |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB394 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren