OK SB387 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB387
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic practice; amending various provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act. Effective date.
Title
Chiropractic practice; amending various provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB387 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019