OK SB372 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Measure failed: Ayes: 10 Nays: 36
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education; protection for certain expressive activities in certain areas; modifying definition to exclude technology center schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; protection for certain expressive activities in certain areas; modifying definition to exclude technology center schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 10 Nays: 36
2019-05-16SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-15SenateEmergency removed
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-08SenateSCs named Daniels, Dahm, Leewright, Paxton, Brooks, Floyd
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-05-02SenateRemove as author Senator Bice; authored by Senator Daniels
2019-05-01Senateremove as principal author Representative Osburn and substitute with Representative Lepak
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 17
2019-04-25HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb372&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB372%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB372%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB372%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB372%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB372%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB372%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB372_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB372_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback