OK SB366 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Impaired driving; modifying inclusions; disallowing certain revocations. Effective date.
Title
Impaired driving; modifying inclusions; disallowing certain revocations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee