OK SB360 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
Pending: House Government Modernization and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
Pending: House Government Modernization and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying term of office for Board members; providing for removal by appointing authorities. Emergency.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying term of office for Board members; providing for removal by appointing authorities. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Wyrick [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-14 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyrick |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |