OK SB354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB354
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; municipal finances; procedures related to auditing requirements.
Title
Cities and towns; municipal finances; procedures related to auditing requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB354 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017