OK SB354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; modifying income limitation for eligibility for Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing for three-year average or the current year, whichever is less, for income limit. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; modifying income limitation for eligibility for Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing for three-year average or the current year, whichever is less, for income limit. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. Mary Easley [D] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Died in GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named DeWitt, Denney, Sears, Cannaday, Fields, Miller, Jackson, Shumate, Carey | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-14 | HAs read | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 5 | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2009-04-13 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | coauthored by Easley | |
2009-02-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) DeWitt | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-04 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |