OK SB352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public bidding; authorizing local bid preference for certain bids. Emergency.
Title
Public bidding; authorizing local bid preference for certain bids. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Vetoed 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Sherrer |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amended |
2015-04-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Newberry |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 10 Nays: 36 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |