OK SB348 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to school performance; requiring the State Department of Education to provide grades for schools; providing certain exceptions; providing for recognition; developing a report card; directing promulgation of rules.
Title
An act relating to school performance; requiring the State Department of Education to provide grades for schools; providing certain exceptions; providing for recognition; developing a report card; directing promulgation of rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Enacting clause restored | |
2011-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Title restored | |
2011-03-31 | Amended | |
2011-03-31 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2011-03-31 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2011-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2011-03-14 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | coauthored by Ford, Stanislawski | |
2011-02-14 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2011-02-14 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |