OK SB344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School buses; penalty. Effective date.
Title
School buses; penalty. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB344 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee