OK SB340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; modifying definition; deleting reimbursement for certain fee. Emergency.
Title
Public buildings and public works; modifying definition; deleting reimbursement for certain fee. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Liebmann (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Liebmann | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-11 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 151 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 152 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 153 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 154 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 155 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 156 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 157 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 62 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |