OK SB335 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem tax; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to provide county assessor certain schedule for specified purpose. Effective date.
Title
Ad valorem tax; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to provide county assessor certain schedule for specified purpose. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/08/2015 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | General Order |
2015-04-01 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |