OK SB317 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
All-terrain vehicles; operational areas of vehicles. Effective date.
Title
All-terrain vehicles; operational areas of vehicles. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Park (principal House author) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boggs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee