OK SB314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB314
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County officers; qualifications to hold or file as candidate for office of county sheriff. Effective date.
Title
County officers; qualifications to hold or file as candidate for office of county sheriff. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Scott, Fry, Yen, Thompson, Shaw, Dossett, Matthews |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Scott |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 30 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Scott |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference