OK SB314 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
Pending: House Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
Pending: House Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; specifying fee for certain tag. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; specifying fee for certain tag. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sparks | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |