OK SB307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; providing that sales are subject to certain taxes; creating certain fund; clarifying and modifying direction of monies. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; providing that sales are subject to certain taxes; creating certain fund; clarifying and modifying direction of monies. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, considered and deferred
2019-03-13SenateBacked up to General Order
2019-03-13SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Daniels
2019-03-13SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 23
2019-03-13SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback