OK SB300 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB300
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways and bridges; making various memorial highway and bridge designations. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highways and bridges; making various memorial highway and bridge designations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Ronny Johns [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Annie Menz [D] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Todd Gollihare [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/22/2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz |
2023-04-24 | House | General Order |
2023-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Johns |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Gollihare |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Gollihare; authored by Senator Haste |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gollihare |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023